CA AB1236 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 598, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 598, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 65850.7 to the Government Code, relating to local ordinances.
Title
Local ordinances: electric vehicle charging stations.
Sponsors
Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Eric Linder [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1236 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1236 Chiu By Beall (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1236 CHIU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1236 Chiu By Beall (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1236 CHIU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 598, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2990.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 2. Page 3005.). |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2588.). |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 7). |
2015-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1595.) |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 15). |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65850.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |