CA AB1226 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 104.12 of, and to add and repeal Section 104.14 of, the Streets and Highways Code, relating to state highways.
Title
State highways: property leases: assessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-19 - Senate - Result (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1226 Holden Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1226 Holden Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 5. Page 1629.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 104.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 104.14 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |