CA AB122 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 21800, 21802, and 22450 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: required stops: bicycles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-01 - Assembly - AB 122 Boerner Horvath Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB122 Boerner Horvath et a By Wiener (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - AB 122 Boerner Horvath Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-03AssemblyConsideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
2022-01-03AssemblyConsideration of Governor's veto pending.
2021-10-08AssemblyVetoed by Governor.
2021-09-08 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2021-09-01AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 19.).
2021-09-01AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 16.)
2021-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 5.).
2021-08-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-07-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2021-07-08SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-29SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 2. Page 1722.) (June 29).
2021-06-21SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-05-27SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-04-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-04-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 11. Page 1150.)
2021-04-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 14).
2021-03-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-24AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-03-23AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (March 22).
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-01-11AssemblyRead first time.
2020-12-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 18.
2020-12-18AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code21800New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code21802New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code22450Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB122
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB122#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB122#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB122#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB122#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB122#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB122#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB122#93ENR
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB122

Bill Comments

feedback