CA AB1217 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 474, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 474, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23039 of, and to add Section 24045.76 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverage licenses: historic cemetery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1217 SANTIAGO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1217 Santiago By De León (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1217 BOCANEGRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1217 Santiago By De León (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1217 BOCANEGRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 474, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6883.). |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 28). |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5268.). |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Portantino. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Measure version as amended on July 19 corrected. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 12). |
2017-07-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1942.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23039 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 24045.76 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 44795 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 59170 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 66000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |