CA AB1196 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14999, 14999.1, 14999.2, 14999.3, 14999.4, 14999.5, 14999.6, 14999.7, 14999.8, 14999.9, and 14999.10 of the Government Code, relating to economic development.
Title
Commission for Economic Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Held under submission. |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14999 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14999.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14999.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14999.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14999.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14999.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14999.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14999.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14999.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14999.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14999.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |