CA AB1194 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 570, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 570, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5150 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Mental health: involuntary commitment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1194 EGGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1194 Eggman By Hernandez (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1194 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1194 Eggman By Hernandez (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1194 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 570, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2990.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3004.). |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2579.). |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2015-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1686.) |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13). |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |