CA AB1175 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-27 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-27 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 19304 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Franchise Tax Board: refunds: direct deposit: taxpayer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1175 FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-20 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-05-26 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-26 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1561.) | |
2011-05-23 | Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-19 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-18 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18). | |
2011-05-05 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-04 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-03 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 2). | |
2011-04-25 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2011-04-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19304 | New Code | See Bill Text |