CA AB1168 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-12 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Limón.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-12 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Limón.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1797.232 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency medical services.
Title
Emergency medical services (EMS): prehospital EMS.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1168 Bennett Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Amendments (Committee's) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Emergency Management] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1168 Bennett Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Amendments (Committee's) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Emergency Management] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Limón. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2023-07-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and GOV. & F. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 1902.) |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1850.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.) |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 26). |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.M. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.M. Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.M. |
2023-04-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.M. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 11). |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.M. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1797.232 | New Code | See Bill Text |