CA AB1164 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 671, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 671, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 53087.7 to the Government Code, relating to water conservation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Water conservation: drought tolerant landscaping.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1164 GATTO Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1164 Gatto By Galgiani (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Natural Resources and Water (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1164 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1164 Gatto By Galgiani (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Natural Resources and Water (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1164 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 671, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3133.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (September 11). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3156.) Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 3165.). |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2635.). |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2015-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and N.R. & W. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1725.) |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14526.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 53087.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 38750 | Amended Code | Citation Text |