CA AB1161 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1113, 12200, 12201, 12213, 12230, 12235, 12240, 12243, 12248, 12253, 12310, 12311, 12313, 12320, 12330, 12331, 12340, 12354, 12364, 12376, 12401, 12402, 12404, 12410, 12440, 12442, 12443, 12446, 12451, 12452, 12453, 12454, 12460, 12461, 12490, 12521, 12530, 12531, 12533, 12534, 12535, 12536, 12537, 12540.1, 12560, 12591, 12626, 12628, 12633, 12634, 12637, 12656, 12658, 12659, 12672, 12673, and 12674 of, to amend the heading of Part 2 (commencing with Section 12200) of Division 3 of, and to add Section 12246.5 to, the Corporations Code, relating to cooperative corporations.
Title
Cooperative corporations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-04-25 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. | |
2011-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Com. on B. & F. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |