CA AB115 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 131502, 131511, 131520, 131521, and 131540 of, and to add Sections 131532 and 131542 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Adult Health Coverage Expansion Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-08-27 - Assembly - AB 115 BEALL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB115 Beall By Alquist (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-04 - Assembly - AB 115 BEALL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB115 Beall By Alquist (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-04 - Assembly - AB 115 BEALL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-14 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2009-10-26 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2009-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2009-09-02 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. | |
2009-08-27 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2753.) | |
2009-08-25 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-08-24 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 1914.) | |
2009-06-30 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-29 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-06-24 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-06-11 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-21 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 20). | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-05-04 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-04 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1238.) | |
2009-04-27 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-04-23 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 22). | |
2009-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-18 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (March 17). | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-01-15 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. | |
2009-01-14 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 131502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 131511 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 131520 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 131521 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 131532 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 131540 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 131542 | New Code | See Bill Text |