CA AB1136 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 42283 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Reusable grocery bag and recycled paper bag: fee: exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 5). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and NAT. RES. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42283 | Amended Code | Citation Text |