CA AB1135 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 40, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 40, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 30515 and 30900 of, and to add Section 30680 to, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: assault weapons.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Sen. Steve Glazer [D] |
Sen. Isadore Hall [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Assembly - AB 1135 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 46 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1135 Levine By Glazer (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1135 AGRI. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1135 Levine By Glazer (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1135 AGRI. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 40, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-07-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 5587.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 5587.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 30. Page 5589.). |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 3900.). |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 16). |
2016-05-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1563.) |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13). |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 47004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 47020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 5918 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 30515 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 30680 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 30900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |