CA AB1132 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 452, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 452, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2893.2 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to telecommunications.
Title
Telecommunications: caller identification fraud.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1132 Gabriel Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Special Consent AB1132 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - AB 1132 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Special Consent AB1132 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - AB 1132 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 452, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3309.). |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.) |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2714.). |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and JUD. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1727.) |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1767.) |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and JUD. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2893.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |