CA AB1119 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 670, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 670, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10103 and 10104 of, and to repeal Section 10105 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities.
Title
Public utilities: municipal corporations: rights of way.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1119 Rendon By Hertzberg (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1119 RENDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1119 RENDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 670, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 2192.). |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-13 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2015-06-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and GOV. & F. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1482.) |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 13). |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and L. GOV. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 10101.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 10103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 10104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 10105 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |