CA AB1106 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 165, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 165, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 27297.6 of, and to amend and repeal Section 27387.1 of, the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Los Angeles County: notice of recordation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-11 - Senate - Special Consent AB1106 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1106 Smith Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1106 Smith Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-31 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 165, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-31 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2057.). |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2019-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 2. Page 1569.) |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 30). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and JUD. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 27297.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 27387.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |