CA AB1077 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 669, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 669, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14305 of the Corporations Code, relating to mutual water companies.
Title
Mutual water companies: open meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-03 - Assembly - AB 1077 HOLDEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1077 Holden By Hertzberg (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1077 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1077 Holden By Hertzberg (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1077 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 669, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2859.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2862.). |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2411.). |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1553.) |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 13). |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 14305 | Amended Code | Citation Text |