CA AB1074 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1060 and 1064 of, and to amend the heading of Chapter 4.5 (commencing with Section 1060) of Part 3 of Division 2 of, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: displaced workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1074 Lorena Gonzalez Concurrence in Senate Amendments By CARRILLO (Y: 51 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1074 Lorena Gonzalez et a By Durazo (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1074 Lorena Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 20 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1074 Lorena Gonzalez et a By Durazo (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1074 Lorena Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 20 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2021-09-28 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2021-09-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 19. Page 3153.). |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 2602.). |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 5). |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 20. Page 1892.) |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 5). |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1060 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1064 | Amended Code | Citation Text |