CA AB1067 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 851, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 851, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 16501.1 of, and to add Section 16001.8 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster children.
Title
Foster children: rights.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Assembly - AB 1067 GIPSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1067 Gipson By McGuire (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1067 GIPSON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1067 Gipson By McGuire (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1067 GIPSON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 851, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6304.). |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5254.). |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3509.) |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-01-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-01-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 12). |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16001.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16001.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16501.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 366.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 366.35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |