CA AB1062 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-03 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-03 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2465 of, and to add Section 2465.5 to, the Probate Code, relating to guardians and conservators.
Title
Conservators and guardians: disposition of property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1062 Mathis Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1534.) |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Probate Code | 2465 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 2465.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |