CA AB1061 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 503, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 503, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 1353.8 of the Civil Code, relating to common interest developments.
Title
Common interest developments: water-efficient landscapes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1061 LIEU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-24 - Senate - Special Consent #15 AB1061 Lieu By Lowenthal (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-09 - Senate - Special Consent #12 AB1061 Lieu (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Assembly - AB 1061 LIEU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-24 - Senate - Special Consent #15 AB1061 Lieu By Lowenthal (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-09 - Senate - Special Consent #12 AB1061 Lieu (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Assembly - AB 1061 LIEU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 503, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-02 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. | |
2009-08-27 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2744.) | |
2009-08-25 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-08-24 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1927.) | |
2009-08-20 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-08-18 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-17 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2009-07-09 | In Senate. Held at Desk. | |
2009-07-09 | In Assembly. Ordered returned to Senate. | |
2009-07-09 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1668.) | |
2009-07-02 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-06-30 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-29 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2009-06-23 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-22 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. | |
2009-06-17 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 16). | |
2009-06-10 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2009-06-01 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-05-27 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD. | |
2009-04-20 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-04-20 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 984.) | |
2009-04-16 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-15 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 14). | |
2009-04-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |