CA AB1038 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 128900) to Part 5 of Division 107 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health data.
Title
Health data: rates for health care services: physicians and surgeons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 128900 | New Code | See Bill Text |