CA AB1038 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 11.1 (commencing with Section 66910) of Part 40 of Division 5 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Postsecondary education: higher education policy.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on . Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66910 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |