CA AB1038 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 510 of, and to add Section 511.5 to, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: flexible work schedules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 511.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |