CA AB1037 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 673, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 673, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3019 of the Elections Code, relating to voting.
Title
Vote by mail ballots: signature verification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1037 Berman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1037 Berman et al. By Newman (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1037 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1037 Berman et al. By Newman (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1037 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 673, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-19 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 18.). |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8.). |
2023-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-07-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 1695.) |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 10). |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2023-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 3019 | Amended Code | Citation Text |