CA AB1029 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 112, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 112, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 70901 and 70902 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: course approval.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1029 Lara (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1029 LARA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1029 LARA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 112, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-07-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-07-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m. | |
2011-07-01 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-07-01 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1689.). | |
2011-06-28 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-06-27 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-06-15 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-26 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-05-12 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-12 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1352.) | |
2011-05-09 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-13 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-07 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2011-04-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 70901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 70902 | Amended Code | Citation Text |