CA AB1020 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 267, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 267, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 18942 of, and to add Sections 116064.1 and 116064.2 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to swimming pools.
Title
Public swimming pools: anti-entrapment devices and
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Emmerson [R] | Asm. Fiona Ma [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-09-03 - Assembly - AB 1020 EMMERSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1020 Emmerson By Strickland (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1020 EMMERSON Third Reading Urgency (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1020 Emmerson By Strickland (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1020 EMMERSON Third Reading Urgency (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 267, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-11 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 7 p.m. | |
2009-09-03 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2970.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 2988.) | |
2009-09-02 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-09-01 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 2049.) | |
2009-08-19 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-18 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 17). | |
2009-08-17 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-23 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 15). Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-09 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-07-06 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-28 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-18 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-02 | Read second time. To third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 1964.) | |
2009-06-01 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 28). | |
2009-05-28 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-05-21 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-20 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-05-19 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 5). | |
2009-04-30 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-04-29 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-28 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-04-21 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-14 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |