CA AB1014 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 872, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 872, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1524 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 18250 of, to add Section 1542.5 to, and to add Division 3.2 (commencing with Section 18100) to Title 2 of Part 6 of, the Penal Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 8105 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Gun violence restraining orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1014 SKINNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 48 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1014 Skinner By Jackson (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1014 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1014 Skinner By Jackson (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1014 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 872, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 29). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6717.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 6719.). |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6616.) |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 8. Page 4891.). |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 17. Page 1875.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 25019 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1524 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1542.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 18100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 18250 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 216 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 218 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2826.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2830 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2832 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |