CA AB1012 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-12 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Padilla.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-12 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Padilla.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2615.6 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
County tax bill: notice: property tax assistance and postponement.
Sponsors
Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1012 GOMEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1012 GOMEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Padilla. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | From special consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1577.) |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 2615.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |