CA AB1011 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1540 of the Code of Civil Procedure and to amend Section 12419.8 of the Government Code, relating to unclaimed property.
Title
Unclaimed property: interest payment.
Sponsors
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 30). |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1540 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12419.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |