CA AB1010 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 176, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 176, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5600.05 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Architects: continuing education.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Assembly - AB 1010 Berman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1010 Berman By Becker (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - AB 1010 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1010 Berman By Becker (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - AB 1010 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 176, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 2739.). |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.) |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2283.). |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 21). |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 7). |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 1069.) |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 14). |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (March 23). |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 5600.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |