CA AB10 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8314.4 to the Government Code, relating to public funds.
Title
Public funding: actions.
Sponsors
Asm. Curt Hagman [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-05 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-31 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |
2009-05-05 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2009-02-05 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2008-12-02 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. | |
2008-12-01 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8314.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |