AZ SCR1044 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-20 - House FR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-20 - House FR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting border security
Title
Supporting border security
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-20 - House - House Federal Relations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | House | House FR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House FR Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-9-5-0) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |