AZ SCR1034 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-20 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-20 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Aggregate expenditure limitation; school districts
Title
Aggregate expenditure limitation; school districts
Sponsors
Sen. Vince Leach [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Sen. Rick Gray [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-18 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Aggregate Expenditure Limitation
Concurrent Resolution
Constitution Of Arizona
Constitutional Amendments (arizona)
Proposing An Amendment To The Constitution Of Arizona
School Districts
Concurrent Resolution
Constitution Of Arizona
Constitutional Amendments (arizona)
Proposing An Amendment To The Constitution Of Arizona
School Districts