AZ SCR1034 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Membership; independent redistricting commission

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Membership; independent redistricting commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateSenate motion to reconsider third reading
2018-05-03SenateSenate final reading FAILED, voting: (13-15-2-0)
2018-05-03SenateSenate concurs
2018-05-02SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2018-05-02SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2018-05-02SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-05-02HouseHouse third reading None voting: (32-25-3-0)
2018-05-02HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-27HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-27HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-26HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-03-22HouseHouse GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-3-0-1-0-0)
2018-03-05HouseHouse read second time
2018-03-01HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-03-01HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2018-03-01HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-03-01HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-28SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0)
2018-02-28SenateSenate motion to amend
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-21SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-14SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2018-02-01SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2018-01-31SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70670
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/scr1034p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/scr1034s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/scr1034h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.scr1034flooryarbrough.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.scr1034coleman2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.scr1034clark.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.scr1034government.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70670&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70670&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70670&billStatusActionId=182111&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70670&billStatusActionId=182112&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70670&billStatusActionId=182127&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70670&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70670&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70670&billStatusActionId=183536&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70670&billStatusActionId=183538&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70670&billStatusActionId=183717&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70670&billStatusActionId=183721&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70670&billStatusActionId=183730&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback