AZ SCR1024 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by HCR2010
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Application; Article V convention; appropriation
Title
Application; Article V convention; appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Senate - Motion HCR 2010 substituted for SCR 1024. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-4-0-0) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HCR2010 (Replaced by) 2017-03-15 - Transmitted to Secretary of State