AZ HCR2010 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Replaces legislation SCR1024

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Application; Article V convention

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Application; Article V convention

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Motion HCR 2010 substituted for SCR 1024. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-15 Transmitted to Secretary of State
2017-03-13HouseTransmit to House
2017-03-13SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2017-02-23SenateSenate motion to reconsider third reading
2017-02-22SenateSenate third reading FAILED voting: (13-17-0-0)
2017-02-22SenateSenate miscellaneous motion: HCR 2010 substituted for SCR 1024. Motion carried.
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-10SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-09HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0)
2017-02-09HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-02-07HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-07HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-06HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-02-06HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-01-31HouseHouse FPRPP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-24HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-23HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-23HouseAssigned to House FPRPP Committee
2017-01-23HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SCR1024 (Replaces) 2017-02-22 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68636
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hcr2010p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hcr2010h.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68636&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68636&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68636&billStatusActionId=174541&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68636&billStatusActionId=175442&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68636&billStatusActionId=175653&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68636&billStatusActionId=174481&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68636&billStatusActionId=175437&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68636&billStatusActionId=176446&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback