AZ SCR1020 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-14 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-14 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
DEMA; recognition; emergency preparedness
Title
DEMA; recognition; emergency preparedness
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-14 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Military and Government Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Military and Government Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-14 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-02 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-03-02 | House read second time | |
2012-03-01 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-01 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-03-01 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-28 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-28 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Consent Calendar February 23, 2012 @ 11:23 AM with Objections | |
2012-02-23 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-23 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-23 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-25 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-16 | Senate VMGA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to Senate VMGA Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-25 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Assigned to Senate VMGA Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |