AZ SCR1018 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - House read second time
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - House read second time
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Independent redistricting commission; population standards
Title
Independent redistricting commission; population standards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to House ELECT Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-03-10 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Concurrent Resolution
Constitution Of Arizona
Constitutional Amendments (arizona)
Independent Redistricting Commission
Population Standards
Proposing An Amendment To The Constitution Of Arizona
Constitution Of Arizona
Constitutional Amendments (arizona)
Independent Redistricting Commission
Population Standards
Proposing An Amendment To The Constitution Of Arizona