AZ SCR1014 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-02 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-02 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Automatic termination; state of emergency
Title
Automatic termination; state of emergency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Adjutant General
Automatic Termination
Emergency Management
Limitation
Powers Of Governor
State Of Emergency
Termination
Writ Of Mandamus
Automatic Termination
Emergency Management
Limitation
Powers Of Governor
State Of Emergency
Termination
Writ Of Mandamus