AZ SCR1009 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-10 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-10 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Inmate labor and services
Title
Inmate labor and services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | Transmitted to Secretary Of State | |
2013-04-04 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-04-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (36-24-0-0) |
2013-03-25 | House | House Consent Calendar March 25, 2013 @ 2:47 PM |
2013-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0-0) |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | House read second time |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2013-03-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar February 25, 2013 @ 1:15 PM with Objections |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-1-0) |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |