AZ SCM1011 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Antiquities act; monuments; urging Congress

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Antiquities act; monuments; urging Congress

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-22 Transmitted to Secretary of State
2017-03-21SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-03-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (32-24-4-0)
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-03-14HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-14HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-13HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-03-13HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-03-07HouseHouse read second time
2017-03-07HouseHouse FPRPP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2017-03-06HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-03-06HouseAssigned to House FPRPP Committee
2017-03-06HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-23HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-23SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0)
2017-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-02-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-13SenateSenate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0)
2017-02-02SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-01SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-01SenateAssigned to Senate NREW Committee
2017-02-01SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69307
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/scm1011p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/scm1011s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/scm1011.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69307&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69307&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69307&billStatusActionId=175638&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69307&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69307&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69307&billStatusActionId=176531&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69307&billStatusActionId=176605&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback