AZ SB1838 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2909
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Chapter 389
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Chapter 389
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unborn child; statutory language.
Title
Unborn child; statutory language.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Motion Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1838 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Motion Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1838 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | Senate | Chapter 389 |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-06-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-25-4-0) |
2021-06-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1838 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2909 (Replaces) 2021-06-25 - House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2909 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading
Subjects
Disposition-transit Permits
Human Remains
Public Health
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Statutory Language
Unborn Child
Human Remains
Public Health
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Statutory Language
Unborn Child
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 2152 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 326 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 329 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |