AZ HB2909 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SB1838
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-25 - House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2909 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-25 - House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2909 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Unborn child; statutory language
Title
Unborn child; statutory language
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - Motion Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2909 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2909 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading |
2021-06-15 | House | House read second time |
2021-06-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1838 (Replaced by) 2021-06-29 - Chapter 389
Subjects
Disposition-transit Permits
Human Remains
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Statutory Language
Unborn Child
Human Remains
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Statutory Language
Unborn Child
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 2152 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 326 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 329 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |