AZ SB1792 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - House read second time
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - House read second time
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Southern Arizona; sports authority; committee
Title
Southern Arizona; sports authority; committee
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-7-0-0) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-1-0) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Advisory Committee
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Committee
Committee On The Formation Of A Southern Arizona Regional Sports Authority
Delayed Repeal
Duties
Establishing
Exemption
Membership
Office Of Tourism
Report
Southern Arizona
Sports Authority
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Committee
Committee On The Formation Of A Southern Arizona Regional Sports Authority
Delayed Repeal
Duties
Establishing
Exemption
Membership
Office Of Tourism
Report
Southern Arizona
Sports Authority