AZ SB1738 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by HB2871
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Tax; revisions; distributions; 2022-2023.
Title
Tax; revisions; distributions; 2022-2023.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Rick Gray [R] |
Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-2-0) |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2871 (Replaced by) 2022-06-28 - Chapter 321
Subjects
2022-2023
Advisory Committee
Applicability
Appropriating Monies
Assessment Of Fees
Conditional Enactment
Department Of Revenue (dor)
Distributions
Dor (see Also: Department Of Revenue)
Entity-level Tax Election
Fund
Integrated Tax System Modernization Project
Membership
Partnerships
Retroactivity
Revisions
S Corporations
Tax
Tax System Modernization Project
Taxation
Taxation - Title 42
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Transportation - Title 28
Advisory Committee
Applicability
Appropriating Monies
Assessment Of Fees
Conditional Enactment
Department Of Revenue (dor)
Distributions
Dor (see Also: Department Of Revenue)
Entity-level Tax Election
Fund
Integrated Tax System Modernization Project
Membership
Partnerships
Retroactivity
Revisions
S Corporations
Tax
Tax System Modernization Project
Taxation
Taxation - Title 42
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Transportation - Title 28
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 8335 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 1009 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5029.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5032.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5041 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5159 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1089 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1089.03 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1184 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 212 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |