AZ SB1694 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Note: Replaces legislation HB2911

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Unemployment compensation; coronavirus disease

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unemployment compensation; coronavirus disease

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (DP/PFC) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27SenateGovernor Signed
2020-03-23SenateTransmitted to Governor
2020-03-23SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-03-23HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2020-03-19HouseTransmit to House
2020-03-19SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2020-03-19SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-03-19SenateSenate read second time
2020-03-18SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-03-18SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-03-18SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-03-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Do pass and proper for consideration, voting: (6-1-1-0)
2020-03-18SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Same As/Similar To

HB2911 (Replaces) 2020-03-23 - House motion to amend

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback