AZ SB1673 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 175
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 175
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Master jury list; juror information
Title
Master jury list; juror information
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-22 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-22 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 175 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (25-3-2-0) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-04-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (48-11-1-0) |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2024-03-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-22 | House | House TI Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0) |
2024-03-12 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-04 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-29 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-8-2-0) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate TTMC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TTMC Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Collection Procedure
Driving Privileges
Failure To Appear
Failure To Pay
Failure To Pay Civil Penalty
Juries - Title 21 (h)
Juror Information (h)
Mandatory Suspension
Master Jury List (h)
Restriction
Restriction Of Driving Privilege
Suspension
Suspension Of Driving Privilege
Transportation - Title 28
Driving Privileges
Failure To Appear
Failure To Pay
Failure To Pay Civil Penalty
Juries - Title 21 (h)
Juror Information (h)
Mandatory Suspension
Master Jury List (h)
Restriction
Restriction Of Driving Privilege
Suspension
Suspension Of Driving Privilege
Transportation - Title 28
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
21 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |