AZ SB1670 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; DPS: school safety program..
Title
Appropriations; DPS: school safety program..
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 10 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 10 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (10-19-1-0) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations
Arizona School Safety Fund
Department Of Public Safety
Dps
Fund
School Safety
School Safety Program
State Government - Title 41
Appropriations
Arizona School Safety Fund
Department Of Public Safety
Dps
Fund
School Safety
School Safety Program
State Government - Title 41