AZ SB1664 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (13-16-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Civil liability; gun-free zones

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil liability; gun-free zones

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05SenateSenate third reading FAILED voting: (13-16-1-0)
2020-03-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-18SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-18SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-17SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-02-13SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2020-02-06SenateSenate read second time
2020-02-05SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-02-05SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2020-02-05SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
133102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
133102.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74035
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1664p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1664s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/s.1664farnsworth e.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1664jud.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1664floorgowan.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74035&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74035&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74035&billStatusActionId=195199&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74035&billStatusActionId=195361&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback